US HCR40 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 117-40-1)
Status: Engrossed on November 30 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-12-12 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 30 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-12-12 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Encouraging reunions of divided Korean American families. Encourages North Korea to allow Korean Americans to meet with their family members from North Korea. Calls on North Korea to take steps to build goodwill that is conducive to peace on the Korean Peninsula.
Title
Encouraging reunions of divided Korean American families.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-12 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2016-12-10 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7127) |
2016-12-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 711. |
2016-12-07 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Corker without amendment and with a preamble. Without written report. |
2016-12-06 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2016-12-06 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. |
2016-11-30 | Senate | Received in the Senate. |
2016-11-29 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2016-11-29 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution Agreed to by voice vote. (text of measure as passed: CR H6349) |
2016-11-29 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Con. Res. 40. |
2016-11-29 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6349-6351) |
2016-11-29 | House | Mr. Royce moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution. |
2015-04-23 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2015-04-23 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2015-04-21 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
2015-04-21 | House | Introduced in House |