US HCR37 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on April 16 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
Pending: House Subcommittee on the Constitution And Civil Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 16 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
Pending: House Subcommittee on the Constitution And Civil Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizing the need to improve physical access to many federally funded facilities for all people of the United States, particularly people with disabilities. Recognizes the hardships that people with disabilities must overcome every day. Reaffirms support of the Architectural Barriers Act of 1968 and the Americans with Disabilities Act of 1990. Recommends that the United States Postal Service and federal agencies install power-assisted doors at post offices and other federally funded facilities to ensure equal access for all people. Pledges to continue to identify and remove the barriers that prevent equal access to federal government services.
Title
Recognizing the need to improve physical access to many federally funded facilities for all people of the United States, particularly people with disabilities.
Sponsors
Rep. Elizabeth Esty [D-CT] | Rep. Joe Courtney [D-CT] | Rep. James Himes [D-CT] | Rep. Rosa DeLauro [D-CT] |
Rep. John Larson [D-CT] | Rep. James Langevin [D-RI] | Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI] | Rep. Joyce Beatty [D-OH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-15 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice. |
2015-04-17 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2015-04-17 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management. |
2015-04-16 | House | Referred to House Transportation and Infrastructure |
2015-04-16 | House | Referred to House Energy and Commerce |
2015-04-16 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2015-04-16 | House | Referred to House Education and the Workforce |
2015-04-16 | House | Referred to House Oversight and Government Reform |
2015-04-16 | House | Referred to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, and in addition to the Committees on Education and the Workforce, the Judiciary, Energy and Commerce, and Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2015-04-16 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SCR12 (Same As) 2015-04-16 - Referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (text of measure as introduced: CR S2254-2255)
SR197 (Same As) 2015-06-09 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3974-3975; text as passed Senate: CR S3932-3933)
SR197 (Same As) 2015-06-09 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3974-3975; text as passed Senate: CR S3932-3933)
Subjects
Disability and health-based discrimination
Disability and paralysis
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics
Postal service
Disability and paralysis
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics
Postal service
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-concurrent-resolution/37/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hconres37/BILLS-114hconres37ih.pdf |