US HCR36 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-9)
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-11-18 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 214.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-11-18 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 214.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Commends the Embassy of Switzerland in Tehran and the government of Switzerland for the ongoing assistance to the U.S. government and to the family of Robert Levinson. Notes that Iranian officials ensured the safety of the Levinson family during their December 2007 visit to Iran and have promised their continued assistance. Urges: (1) the government of Iran to intensify its cooperation on the Levinson investigation with the Embassy of Switzerland in Tehran and to share the results of its investigation with the Federal Bureau of Investigation (FBI); and (2) the President and U.S. allies to raise the Levinson case at every opportunity in all appropriate fora. Expresses sympathy to the family of Robert Levinson.
Title
A concurrent resolution calling on the President and the allies of the United States to raise in all appropriate bilateral and multilateral fora the case of Robert Levinson at every opportunity, urging Iran to fulfill their promises of assistance to the family of Robert Levinson, and calling on Iran to share the results of its investigation into the disappearance of Robert Levinson with the Federal Bureau of Investigation.
Sponsors
Rep. Gary Ackerman [D-NY] | Rep. Shelley Berkley [D-NV] | Rep. Gus Bilirakis [R-FL] | Rep. Corrine Brown [D-FL] |
Rep. Vern Buchanan [R-FL] | Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA] | Rep. Ander Crenshaw [R-FL] | Rep. Joseph Crowley [D-NY] |
Rep. Eliot Engel [D-NY] | Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL] | Rep. Bob Inglis [R-SC] | Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX] |
Rep. Peter King [R-NY] | Rep. Ron Klein [D-FL] | Rep. Suzanne Kosmas [D-FL] | Rep. Connie Mack [R-FL] |
Rep. Carolyn Maloney [D-NY] | Rep. Michael McMahon [D-NY] | Rep. Kendrick Meek [D-FL] | Rep. Brad Miller [D-NC] |
Rep. Adam Putnam [R-FL] | Rep. Mike J. Rogers [R-MI] | Rep. Steven Rothman [D-NJ] | Rep. Albio Sires [D-NJ] |
Rep. Cliff Stearns [R-FL] | Rep. Debbie Wasserman Schultz [D-FL] | Rep. Anthony Weiner [D-NY] | Rep. Robert Wexler [D-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-11-18 | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 214. | |
2009-11-18 | Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Kerry without amendment and with a preamble. Without written report. | |
2009-11-17 | Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. | |
2009-04-29 | Received in the Senate and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. | |
2009-04-28 | The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection. | |
2009-04-28 | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. | |
2009-04-28 | On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4864-4865) | |
2009-04-28 | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Con. Res. 36. | |
2009-04-28 | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4864-4866) | |
2009-04-28 | Mr. Scott (GA) moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended. | |
2009-03-25 | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent. | |
2009-03-25 | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. | |
2009-02-03 | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR4 (Same As) 2009-03-10 - Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
Subjects
Alliances
Congressional tributes
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Europe
Government investigations
International affairs
Iran
Middle East
Switzerland
Congressional tributes
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Europe
Government investigations
International affairs
Iran
Middle East
Switzerland