US HCR33 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-15 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-15 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Designating the George C. Marshall Museum and George C. Marshall Research Library in Lexington, Virginia, as the National George C. Marshall Museum and Library. Designates the George C. Marshall Museum and George C. Marshall Research Library in Lexington, Virginia, as the "National George C. Marshall Museum and Library."
Title
Designating the George C. Marshall Museum and George C. Marshall Research Library in Lexington, Virginia, as the National George C. Marshall Museum and Library.
Sponsors
Rep. Bob Goodlatte [R-VA] | Rep. Don Beyer [D-VA] | Rep. Dave Brat [R-VA] | Rep. Barbara Comstock [R-VA] |
Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA] | Rep. Thomas Garrett [R-VA] | Rep. Morgan Griffith [R-VA] | Rep. Donald McEachin [D-VA] |
Rep. Robert Scott [D-VA] | Rep. Scott Taylor [R-VA] | Rep. Robert Wittman [R-VA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-15 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held. |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Received in the Senate and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
2017-06-07 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2017-06-07 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4674-4675) |
2017-06-07 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Con. Res. 33. |
2017-06-07 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4674-4676) |
2017-06-07 | House | Mr. Brat moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution. |
2017-03-15 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce. |
2017-03-15 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SCR9 (Related) 2017-03-15 - Referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S1848; text of measure as introduced: CR S1847-1848)
Subjects
Arts, culture, religion
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Libraries and archives
Military history
Museums, exhibitions, cultural centers
U.S. history
Virginia
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Libraries and archives
Military history
Museums, exhibitions, cultural centers
U.S. history
Virginia