US HCR266 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on August 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-08-05 - Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on August 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-08-05 - Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Expresses the sense of Congress that: (1) the government of Taiwan should be accorded observer status in the International Civil Aviation Organization (ICAO); (2) the U.S. government should take a leading role in gaining international support for granting Taiwan ICAO observer status; and (3) the Department of State should brief or consult with Congress on U.S. government efforts in support of Taiwan's progress toward ICAO observer status.
Title
Expressing the sense of Congress that Taiwan should be accorded observer status in the International Civil Aviation Organization (ICAO).
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-08-05 | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. | |
2010-08-02 | Received in the Senate. | |
2010-07-29 | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. | |
2010-07-29 | On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR 7/29/2010 H6083) | |
2010-07-29 | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR 7/30/2010 H6418) | |
2010-07-27 | At the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Ms. Berkley objected to the vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed. The point of no quorum was withdrawn. | |
2010-07-27 | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Con. Res. 266. | |
2010-07-27 | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6083-6085) | |
2010-07-27 | Ms. Berkley moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution. | |
2010-04-21 | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR63 (Same As) 2010-05-18 - Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. (text of measure as introduced: CR S3910)
Subjects
Asia
Aviation and airports
Congressional oversight
International affairs
International organizations and cooperation
Taiwan
Transportation safety and security
Aviation and airports
Congressional oversight
International affairs
International organizations and cooperation
Taiwan
Transportation safety and security