US HCR263 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-07 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-07 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the use of the Capitol grounds for the 25th Annual District of Columbia Special Olympics Law Enforcement Torch Run on June 4, 2010.
Title
Authorizing the use of the Capitol Grounds for the District of Columbia Special Olympics Law Enforcement Torch Run.
Sponsors
Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA] | Rep. Elijah Cummings [D-MD] | Rep. Mario Diaz-Balart [R-FL] | Rep. Donna Edwards [D-MD] |
Rep. Steny Hoyer [D-MD] | Rep. James Moran [D-VA] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Sen. Chris Van Hollen [D-MD] |
Rep. Frank Wolf [R-VA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-07 | Message on Senate action sent to the House. | |
2010-05-07 | Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3433) | |
2010-05-06 | Received in the Senate. | |
2010-05-05 | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. | |
2010-05-05 | On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H3168) | |
2010-05-05 | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Con. Res. 263. | |
2010-05-05 | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3168-3170) | |
2010-05-05 | Ms. Brown, Corrine moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution. | |
2010-05-04 | Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 188. | |
2010-05-04 | Reported by the Committee on Transportation. H. Rept. 111-470. | |
2010-04-29 | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. | |
2010-04-29 | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. | |
2010-04-29 | Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management Discharged. | |
2010-04-22 | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management. | |
2010-04-21 | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
Same As/Similar To
HCR39 (Related) 2009-03-18 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.