US HCR247 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-07 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-07 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Permits the Greater Washington Soap Box Derby Association to sponsor soap box derby races as a free public event on the Capitol grounds on June 19, 2010.
Title
Authorizing the use of the Capitol Grounds for the Greater Washington Soap Box Derby.
Sponsors
Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA] | Rep. Donna Edwards [D-MD] | Rep. Steny Hoyer [D-MD] | Rep. James Moran [D-VA] |
Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Sen. Chris Van Hollen [D-MD] | Rep. Frank Wolf [R-VA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-07 | Message on Senate action sent to the House. | |
2010-05-07 | Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3433) | |
2010-05-06 | Received in the Senate. | |
2010-05-05 | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. | |
2010-05-05 | On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H3170) | |
2010-05-05 | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Con. Res. 247. | |
2010-05-05 | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3170-3171) | |
2010-05-05 | Ms. Brown, Corrine moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution. | |
2010-05-04 | Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 189. | |
2010-05-04 | Reported by the Committee on Transportation. H. Rept. 111-471. | |
2010-04-29 | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. | |
2010-04-29 | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. | |
2010-04-29 | Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management Discharged. | |
2010-03-05 | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management. | |
2010-03-04 | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
Same As/Similar To
HCR37 (Related) 2009-03-13 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.