US HCR24 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-14 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-14 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
This concurrent resolution calls for the full release to Congress and the public release, as allowed by law, of any report (including findings) Special Counsel Mueller provides to the Department of Justice.
Title
Expressing the sense of Congress that the report of Special Counsel Mueller should be made available to the public and to Congress.
Sponsors
Rep. Jerrold Nadler [D-NY] | Rep. Maxine Waters [D-CA] | Rep. Adam Schiff [D-CA] | Rep. Elijah Cummings [D-MD] |
Rep. Eliot Engel [D-NY] | Rep. Richard Neal [D-MA] | Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA] | Rep. Lloyd Doggett [D-TX] |
Rep. Charlie Crist [D-FL] | Rep. Danny Davis [D-IL] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-14 - House - On agreeing to the resolution RC# 125 (Y: 420 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-14 | Senate | Received in the Senate. |
2019-03-14 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-03-14 | House | On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 420 - 0, 4 Present (Roll no. 125). (text: CR H2723) |
2019-03-14 | House | The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule. |
2019-03-14 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H. Con. Res. 24. |
2019-03-14 | House | Rule provides for consideration of H. Con. Res. 24 with 1 hour of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions. Rule provides for consideration H. Con. Res. 24 under a closed rule; Rule also provides for proceedings during the period from March 15, 2019, through March 22, 2019 |
2019-03-14 | House | Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 208. (consideration: CR H2723-2732) |
2019-03-13 | House | Rule H. Res. 208 passed House. |
2019-03-11 | House | Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 208 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H. Con. Res. 24 with 1 hour of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions. Rule provides for consideration H. Con. Res. 24 under a closed rule; Rule also provides for proceedings during the period from March 15, 2019, through March 22, 2019 |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2019-03-07 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HR208 (Related) 2019-03-13 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Congressional oversight
Crime and law enforcement
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Criminal justice information and records
Department of Justice
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Federal officials
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Government information and archives
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
Russia
Subversive activities
Crime and law enforcement
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Criminal justice information and records
Department of Justice
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Federal officials
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Government information and archives
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
Russia
Subversive activities