US HCR211 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 19 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-26 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 19 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-26 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.) Recognizes the 75th anniversary of the establishment of the East Bay Regional Park District in California. Honors the board members, general managers, and East Bay Regional Park District staff who have dutifully fulfilled the mission of protecting open space and providing outdoor recreation opportunities for generations of families in East Bay.
Title
Recognizing the 75th anniversary of the establishment of the East Bay Regional Park District in California, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. John Garamendi [D-CA] | Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA] | Rep. Jerry McNerney [D-CA] | Rep. George Miller [D-CA] |
Rep. Fortney Stark [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-26 | Message on Senate action sent to the House. | |
2010-05-25 | Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. | |
2010-05-25 | Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4394) | |
2010-05-19 | Received in the Senate and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. | |
2010-05-18 | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. | |
2010-05-18 | On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H3492) | |
2010-05-18 | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Con. Res. 211. | |
2010-05-18 | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3492-3493) | |
2010-05-18 | Mr. Miller, George moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution. | |
2009-11-09 | Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests and Public Lands. | |
2009-11-06 | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR47 (Same As) 2009-11-05 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text of measure as introduced: CR S11223)
Subjects
California
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Land use and conservation
Outdoor recreation
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Land use and conservation
Outdoor recreation
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources