US HCR186 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 71-2)
Status: Engrossed on September 30 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-10-01 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 30 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-10-01 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Expresses support for the goals and ideals of Sickle Cell Disease Awareness Month.
Title
Supporting the goals and ideals of Sickle Cell Disease Awareness Month.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-10-01 | Message on Senate action sent to the House. | |
2009-09-30 | Received in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S9991) | |
2009-09-29 | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. | |
2009-09-29 | On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H10016) | |
2009-09-29 | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Con. Res. 186. | |
2009-09-29 | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H10016-10018) | |
2009-09-29 | Mr. Lynch moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution. | |
2009-09-24 | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. | |
2009-09-24 | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. | |
2009-09-16 | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. |
Same As/Similar To
HR1663 (Related) 2010-09-28 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.