US HCR17 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-17 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-17 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Declares that when the House adjourns on the legislative day of Thursday, February 17, 2011, Friday, February 18, 2011, or Saturday, February 19, 2011, it stand adjourned until 2 p.m. on Monday, February 28, 2011. Declares that when the Senate recesses or adjourns on any day from Thursday, February 17, 2011, through Friday, February 25, 2011, it stand recessed or adjourned until noon on Monday, February 28, 2011.
Title
Providing for an adjournment or recess of the two Houses.
Sponsors
Rep. Rob Woodall [R-GA] |
Roll Calls
2011-02-15 - House - On Agreeing to the Resolution (Y: 243 N: 176 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-17 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2011-02-17 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S926; text as passed Senate: CR S926) |
2011-02-16 | Senate | Received in the Senate. |
2011-02-15 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2011-02-15 | House | On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to by recorded vote: 243 - 176 (Roll no. 40). (text: CR H815) |
2011-02-15 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H817) |
2011-02-15 | House | POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - The Chair put the question on the adoption of the concurrent resolution, and by voice vote, the Chair announced the noes had prevailed. Mr. Woodall objected to the vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed. The point of no quorum was withdrawn. |
2011-02-15 | House | Considered as privileged matter. (consideration: CR H815) |
Same As/Similar To
SCR38 (Related) 2012-03-30 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.