US HCR16 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-13 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-13 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Permits the Greater Washington Soap Box Derby Association to sponsor soap box derby races as a free public event on the Capitol grounds on June 18, 2011.
Title
Authorizing the use of the Capitol Grounds for the Greater Washington Soap Box Derby.
Sponsors
Rep. Steny Hoyer [D-MD] | Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA] | Rep. Donna Edwards [D-MD] | Rep. James Moran [D-VA] |
Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Sen. Chris Van Hollen [D-MD] | Rep. Frank Wolf [R-VA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-13 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2011-05-12 | Senate | Received in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2971-2972) |
2011-05-11 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2011-05-11 | House | On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to without objection. (text: CR H3188-3189) |
2011-05-11 | House | Considered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H3188-3189) |
2011-05-11 | House | Committee on Transportation discharged. |
2011-05-11 | House | Mr. Denham asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider. |
2011-02-10 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management. |
2011-02-09 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
Same As/Similar To
HCR106 (Related) 2012-05-10 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.