US HCR14 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, And Investigations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, And Investigations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expressing the sense of Congress that John Arthur "Jack" Johnson should receive a posthumous pardon for the racially motivated conviction in 1913 that diminished the athletic, cultural, and historic significance of Jack Johnson and unduly tarnished his reputation. Expresses the sense of Congress that Jack Johnson (the first African-American professional boxer to hold the title of Heavyweight Champion of the World) should receive a posthumous pardon to expunge from the annals of American criminal justice a racially motivated abuse of the federal government's prosecutorial authority and to recognize his athletic and cultural contributions to society.
Title
Expressing the sense of Congress that John Arthur "Jack" Johnson should receive a posthumous pardon for the racially motivated conviction in 1913 that diminished the athletic, cultural, and historic significance of Jack Johnson and unduly tarnished his reputation.
Sponsors
Rep. Peter King [R-NY] | Rep. Gregory Meeks [D-NY] | Rep. Lacy Clay [D-MO] | Rep. John Conyers [D-MI] |
Rep. Charles Rangel [D-NY] | Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] | Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] | Rep. Michael Honda [D-CA] |
Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA] | Rep. David Scott [D-GA] | Rep. Donald Payne [D-NJ] | Rep. Joyce Beatty [D-OH] |
Rep. Brenda Lawrence [D-MI] | Rep. Bennie Thompson [D-MS] | Rep. Maxine Waters [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-19 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations. |
2015-02-04 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2015-02-04 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SCR6 (Same As) 2015-02-26 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text of measure as introduced: CR S1172)
SB1177 (Related) 2016-03-17 - By Senator Alexander from Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions filed written report. Report No. 114-231. Additional views filed.
SB1177 (Related) 2016-03-17 - By Senator Alexander from Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions filed written report. Report No. 114-231. Additional views filed.
Subjects
Athletes
Congressional tributes
Crime and law enforcement
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
Professional sports
Racial and ethnic relations
U.S. history
Congressional tributes
Crime and law enforcement
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
Professional sports
Racial and ethnic relations
U.S. history
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-concurrent-resolution/14/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hconres14/BILLS-114hconres14ih.pdf |