US HCR133 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on July 23 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-07-27 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 23 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-07-27 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the use of the rotunda of the United States Capitol on September 12, 2012, for the presentation of the Congressional Gold Medal to Arnold Palmer, in recognition of his service to the nation in promoting excellence and good sportsmanship in golf.
Title
Authorizing the use of the rotunda of the United States Capitol for an event to present the Congressional Gold Medal to Arnold Palmer, in recognition of his service to the Nation in promoting excellence and good sportsmanship in golf.
Sponsors
Rep. Tim Murphy [R-PA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-27 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2012-07-26 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5628) |
2012-07-23 | Senate | Received in the Senate. |
2012-07-19 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2012-07-19 | House | On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to without objection. (text: CR H5072) |
2012-07-19 | House | Considered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H5072) |
2012-07-19 | House | Mr. Lungren, Daniel E. asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider. |
2012-07-19 | House | Committee on House Administration discharged. |
2012-07-17 | House | Referred to the House Committee on House Administration. |