US HCR133 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-22 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-22 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Declares that, when the House adjourns on any legislative day from Thursday, May 21, 2009, through Sunday, May 24, 2009, it stand adjourned until 2 p.m. on Tuesday, June 2, 2009. Declares that, when the Senate recesses or adjourns on any day from Thursday, May 21, 2009, through Sunday, May 24, 2009, it stand recessed or adjourned until 12 p.m. on Monday, June 1, 2009.
Title
Providing for an adjournment or recess of the two Houses.
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Arcuri [D-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-22 | Message on Senate action sent to the House. | |
2009-05-21 | Received in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5886-5887; text as passed Senate: CR S5886-5887) | |
2009-05-21 | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. | |
2009-05-21 | On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 237 - 184 (Roll no. 282). (text: CR H5904) | |
2009-05-21 | Considered as privileged matter. (consideration: CR H5904) |