US HCR13 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 29-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-14 - Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-14 - Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expressing the sense of Congress that the radical Islamic movement in Afghanistan known as the Taliban should be recognized officially as a foreign terrorist organization by the United States Government. Calls on the Department of State and the Administration to recognize officially the Taliban as a foreign terrorist organization. Requests the Secretary of State to designate the Taliban as a foreign terrorist organization and impose any and all applicable restrictions and sanctions.
Title
Expressing the sense of Congress that the radical Islamic movement in Afghanistan known as the Taliban should be recognized officially as a foreign terrorist organization by the United States Government.
Sponsors
Rep. David McKinley [R-WV] | Rep. Scott Tipton [R-CO] | Rep. Joseph Pitts [R-PA] | Rep. Larry Bucshon [R-IN] |
Rep. Mo Brooks [R-AL] | Rep. Trent Franks [R-AZ] | Rep. Garland Barr [R-KY] | Rep. Andy Harris [R-MD] |
Rep. Michael Burgess [R-TX] | Rep. Robert Pittenger [R-NC] | Rep. Michael Conaway [R-TX] | Rep. Randy Neugebauer [R-TX] |
Rep. Doug Lamborn [R-CO] | Rep. Steve Chabot [R-OH] | Rep. Jackie Walorski [R-IN] | Rep. Joe Wilson [R-SC] |
Rep. Pete Sessions [R-TX] | Rep. Jeff Duncan [R-SC] | Rep. Austin Scott [R-GA] | Rep. Jeff Miller [R-FL] |
Rep. Paul Gosar [R-AZ] | Rep. Evan Jenkins [R-WV] | Rep. Alexander Mooney [R-WV] | Rep. Randy Weber [R-TX] |
Rep. Robert Latta [R-OH] | Rep. Robert Wittman [R-VA] | Rep. Brian Babin [R-TX] | Rep. Steven Palazzo [R-MS] |
Rep. Ken Calvert [R-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-14 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2015-05-14 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2015-05-13 | House | Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security Discharged. |
2015-02-19 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security. |
2015-02-03 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2015-02-03 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Afghanistan
Asia
Foreign property
Immigration status and procedures
International affairs
Sanctions
Terrorism
Visas and passports
Asia
Foreign property
Immigration status and procedures
International affairs
Sanctions
Terrorism
Visas and passports
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-concurrent-resolution/13/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hconres13/BILLS-114hconres13ih.pdf |