US HCR129 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-18)
Status: Engrossed on December 3 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-12-03 - Received in the Senate and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 3 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-12-03 - Received in the Senate and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Congratulates the Sailors of the United States Submarine Force upon the completion of 1,000 Ohio-class ballistic missile submarine (SSBN) deterrent patrols. Honors and thanks the crews of such submarines and their families for their continued dedication and sacrifice.
Title
Congratulating the Sailors of the United States Submarine Force upon the completion of 1,000 Ohio-class ballistic missile submarine (SSBN) deterrent patrols.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-12-03 | Received in the Senate and referred to the Committee on Armed Services. | |
2009-12-02 | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. | |
2009-12-02 | On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 412 - 0 (Roll no. 915). (text: CR H13394) | |
2009-12-02 | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H13408-13409) | |
2009-12-02 | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. | |
2009-12-02 | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Con. Res. 129. | |
2009-12-02 | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H13394-13395) | |
2009-12-02 | Mr. Kissell moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution. | |
2009-06-08 | Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel. | |
2009-05-20 | Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR10 (Same As) 2009-04-27 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Congressional tributes
Military personnel and dependents
Military readiness
Congressional tributes
Military personnel and dependents
Military readiness