US HCR121 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-24 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-24 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Directing the Secretary of the Senate to make a correction in the enrollment of the bill S. 2372. Directs the Secretary of the Senate to make a correction in the enrollment of S. 2372 (VA MISSION Act of 2018) to amend the title.
Title
Directing the Secretary of the Senate to make a correction in the enrollment of the bill S. 2372.
Sponsors
Rep. David Roe [R-TN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-24 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2882) |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Received in the Senate. |
2018-05-16 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-05-16 | House | On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to without objection. (text: CR H4058) |
2018-05-16 | House | Considered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H4058) |
2018-05-16 | House | Mr. Roe (TN) asked unanimous consent to consider as introduced. |
2018-05-16 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2372 (Related) 2018-06-06 - Became Public Law No: 115-182.