US HCR121 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 8 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-12-12 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 8 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-12-12 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the Clerk of the House of Representatives, in the enrollment of H.B. 3979, to revise the official title of such bill to read: "An Act to authorize appropriations for fiscal year 2015 for military activities of the Department of Defense, for military construction, and for defense activities of the Department of Energy, to prescribe military personnel strengths for such fiscal year, and for other purposes".
Title
Providing for a correction in the enrollment of the bill H.B. 3979.
Sponsors
Rep. Howard McKeon [R-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-12 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2014-12-12 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6739) |
2014-12-08 | Senate | Received in the Senate. |
2014-12-04 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2014-12-04 | House | On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8652) |
2014-12-04 | House | Considered as privileged matter. (consideration: CR H8652) |
Same As/Similar To
HB3979 (Related) 2014-12-19 - Became Public Law No: 113-291.
Subjects
Congress
Defense spending
Department of Defense
Department of Energy
Executive agency funding and structure
Defense spending
Department of Defense
Department of Energy
Executive agency funding and structure