US HCR120 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-14 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-14 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the use of the Capitol Grounds for the 3rd Annual Fallen Firefighters Congressional Flag Presentation Ceremony. Permits the Congressional Fire Services Institute and the National Fallen Firefighters Foundation to sponsor the 3rd Annual Fallen Firefighters Congressional Flag Presentation Ceremony as a free public event on the Capitol grounds on September 28, 2016, to honor the firefighters who died in the line of duty in 2015. Authorizes the Capitol Police Board to allow the sponsor, as part of the event, to use traditional, hand-held fire equipment, such as axes and Pulaski tools, and any other fire equipment that the Board determines can be used in a safe manner and will not cause damage to the Capitol grounds or harm to any individual.
Title
Authorizing the use of the Capitol Grounds for the 3rd Annual Fallen Firefighters Congressional Flag Presentation Ceremony.
Sponsors
Rep. Peter King [R-NY] | Rep. Bill Pascrell [D-NJ] | Rep. Steny Hoyer [D-MD] | Rep. David Reichert [R-WA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-14 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Received in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2064-2065) |
2016-04-12 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2016-04-12 | House | On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to without objection. (text: CR H1620) |
2016-04-12 | House | Considered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H1619-1620) |
2016-04-12 | House | Mr. Barletta asked unanimous consent to take from the Speaker's table and consider. |
2016-03-23 | House | Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 101. |
2016-03-23 | House | Reported by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 114-467. |
2016-03-02 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2016-03-02 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2016-03-02 | House | Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management Discharged. |
2016-02-29 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management. |
2016-02-26 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
2016-02-26 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HCR73 (Related) 2015-09-17 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.