US HCR119 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 49-0)
Status: Engrossed on July 23 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-07-23 - Received in the Senate and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Expressing the sense of Congress that a carbon tax would be detrimental to the United States economy. Expresses the sense of Congress that a carbon tax would be detrimental to American families and businesses and is not in the best interest of the United States.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Expressing the sense of Congress that a carbon tax would be detrimental to the United States economy.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-07-19 - House - On agreeing to the resolution RC# 363 (Y: 229 N: 180 NV: 19 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-23SenateReceived in the Senate and referred to the Committee on Finance.
2018-07-19HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2018-07-19HouseOn agreeing to the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 229 - 180, 2 Present (Roll no. 363). (text: CR H6563)
2018-07-19HouseThe previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
2018-07-19HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H. Con. Res. 119.
2018-07-19HouseRule provides for consideration of H. Con. Res. 119 with 1 hour of general debate. Measure will be considered read. Bill is closed to amendments.
2018-07-19HouseConsidered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 1001. (consideration: CR H6563-6569)
2018-07-18HouseRule H. Res. 1001 passed House.
2018-07-17HouseRules Committee Resolution H. Res. 1001 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H. Con. Res. 119 with 1 hour of general debate. Measure will be considered read. Bill is closed to amendments.
2018-04-26HouseReferred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
2018-04-26HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HR1001 (Related) 2018-07-18 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback