US HCR112 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-17 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-17 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the use of Emancipation Hall in the Capitol Visitor Center for an event to celebrate the birthday of King Kamehameha I. (Sec. 1) Authorizes the use of Emancipation Hall in the Capitol Visitor Center for an event on June 10, 2018, to celebrate the birthday of King Kamehameha I.
Title
Authorizing the use of Emancipation Hall in the Capitol Visitor Center for an event to celebrate the birthday of King Kamehameha I.
Sponsors
Rep. Colleen Hanabusa [D-HI] | Rep. Tulsi Gabbard [D-HI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-17 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2733) |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Received in the Senate. |
2018-05-09 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-05-09 | House | On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to without objection. (text: CR H3866) |
2018-05-09 | House | Considered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H3866) |
2018-05-09 | House | Mr. Harper asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider. |
2018-05-09 | House | Committee on House Administration discharged. |
2018-03-08 | House | Referred to the House Committee on House Administration. |
2018-03-08 | House | Introduced in House |