US HCR111 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-13 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-13 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizing and supporting the efforts of the United Bid Committee to bring the 2026 Fédération Internationale de Football Association (FIFA) World Cup competition to Canada, Mexico, and the United States. Supports the efforts of the United Bid Committee to bring the 2026 Federation Internationale de Football Association (FIFA) World Cup competition to Canada, Mexico, and the United States.
Title
Recognizing and supporting the efforts of the United Bid Committee to bring the 2026 Fédération Internationale de Football Association (FIFA) World Cup competition to Canada, Mexico, and the United States.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-24 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended RC# 148 (Y: 392 N: 3 NV: 33 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-13 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Senate Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3862) |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Received in the Senate and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
2018-04-24 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-04-24 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 392 - 3 (Roll no. 148). (text: CR H3474) |
2018-04-24 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H3491-3492) |
2018-04-24 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2018-04-24 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Con. Res. 111. |
2018-04-24 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3474-3476) |
2018-04-24 | House | Mr. Royce (CA) moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended. |
2018-03-15 | House | Committee Agreed to Seek Consideration Under Suspension of the Rules, by Unanimous Consent. |
2018-03-15 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent. |
2018-03-15 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2018-03-05 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
2018-03-05 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SCR38 (Same As) 2018-06-07 - Referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. (text of measure as introduced: CR S3296)
Subjects
Canada
International organizations and cooperation
Latin America
Mexico
Professional sports
Sports and recreation
International organizations and cooperation
Latin America
Mexico
Professional sports
Sports and recreation