US HCR105 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Engrossed on July 28 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-07-28 - Received in the Senate and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 28 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-07-28 - Received in the Senate and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits the President from deploying or maintaining U.S. Armed Forces in a sustained combat role in Iraq without specific statutory authorization enacted after the adoption of this concurrent resolution. States that nothing in this concurrent resolution supersedes the requirements of the War Powers Resolution.
Title
Prohibiting the President from deploying or maintaining United States Armed Forces in a sustained combat role in Iraq without specific, subsequent statutory authorization.
Sponsors
Rep. James McGovern [D-MA] | Rep. Keith Ellison [D-MN] | Rep. Sam Farr [D-CA] | Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] |
Rep. Rush Holt [D-NJ] | Rep. Michael Honda [D-CA] | Rep. Walter Jones [R-NC] | Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA] |
Rep. Jim McDermott [D-WA] | Rep. Kurt Schrader [D-OR] |
Roll Calls
2014-07-25 - House - On Agreeing to the Resolution, As Amended (Y: 370 N: 40 NV: 22 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-28 | Senate | Received in the Senate and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. |
2014-07-25 | House | The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection. |
2014-07-25 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2014-07-25 | House | On agreeing to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 370 - 40 (Roll no. 452). (text: CR H6819) |
2014-07-25 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H6833-6834) |
2014-07-25 | House | POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on H.Con.Res. 105, the Chair put the question on the adoption of the resolution, as amended, and by voice vote, announced that the ayes had prevailed. Mr. McGovern demanded the yeas and nays and the Chair postponed further proceedings on the question on adoption of the resolution, as amended, until later in the legislative day. |
2014-07-25 | House | The previous question was ordered pursuant to a previous order of the House. (CR H6825) |
2014-07-25 | House | DEBATE - Pursuant to a previous order of the House of Wednesday, July 23, 2014, the amendment numbered 1 printed in the Congressional Record is considered adopted. The House proceeded with one hour debate on H.Con.Res. 105. |
2014-07-25 | House | Considered pursuant to a previous order. (consideration: CR H6819-6825) |
2014-07-25 | House | Consideration initiated pursuant to a previous order. |
2014-07-23 | House | ORDER OF BUSINESS - Mr. Nugent asked unanimous consent that it be in order at any time to consider H.Con.Res. 105 in the House, if called up by the Chair of the Committee on Foreign Affairs or his designee; that the amendment printed in the portion of the Congressional Record designated for that purpose in clause 8 of rule XVIII and numbered 1 be considered as adopted; that the concurrent resolution, as amended, be considered as read; and that the previous question be considered as ordered on the concurrent resolution, as amended, to adoption without intervening motion or demand for division of the question except one hour of debate equally divided and controlled by Mr. Royce of California and Mr. McGovern of Massachusetts or their respective designees. Agreed to without objection. (consideration: CR H6695) |
2014-07-11 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
2014-07-11 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H6127) |
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Congressional oversight
Iraq
Middle East
Military operations and strategy
Military personnel and dependents
War and emergency powers
Congressional oversight
Iraq
Middle East
Military operations and strategy
Military personnel and dependents
War and emergency powers