US HCR104 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 18 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-12-18 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 18 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-12-18 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Providing for the sine die adjournment of the first session of the One Hundred Fourteenth Congress. Declares that when the House adjourns on any legislative day from Friday, December 18, 2015, through Saturday, January 2, 2016, it stand adjourned sine die. Declares that when the Senate: adjourns on any day from Friday, December 18, 2015, through Tuesday, December 22, 2015, it stand adjourned sine die; and recesses or adjourns on any day of the second session of the 114th Congress from Sunday, January 3, 2016, through Friday, January 8, 2016, it stand recessed or adjourned until noon on Monday, January 11, 2016.
Title
Providing for the sine die adjournment of the first session of the One Hundred Fourteenth Congress.
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Price [R-GA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-18 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2015-12-18 | Senate | Received in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S8907-8908; text as passed Senate: CR S8907-8908) |
2015-12-18 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2015-12-18 | House | On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to without objection. (text: CR H10707-10708) |
2015-12-18 | House | Considered as privileged matter. (consideration: CR H10707-10708) |
2015-12-18 | House | Introduced in House |