US HB975 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-15)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Respect State Marijuana Laws Act of 2017 This bill amends the Controlled Substances Act to provide that the Act's regulatory controls and administrative, civil, and criminal penalties do not apply to a person who produces, possesses, distributes, dispenses, administers, or delivers marijuana in compliance with state laws.
Title
Respect State Marijuana Laws Act of 2017
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-10 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2017-02-07 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations. |
2017-02-07 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-02-07 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-02-07 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-02-07 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H1075-1078) |
2017-02-07 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB6043 (Related) 2018-07-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
SB3032 (Related) 2018-06-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB3032 (Related) 2018-06-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Subjects
Alternative treatments
Crime and law enforcement
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
State and local government operations
Crime and law enforcement
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
State and local government operations
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/975/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr975/BILLS-115hr975ih.pdf |