US HB964 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-27 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 306.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-27 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 306.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes ethics requirements for a President-elect's transition team. The bill requires a President-elect to submit to Congress a report with a list of any individual (1) for whom an application for a security clearance was submitted, by 10 days after its submission; or (2) provided a security clearance, by 10 days after it was provided. The Federal Transition Coordinator must negotiate a memorandum of understanding with the transition representative of each eligible candidate by October 1 (currently November 1) of a year during which a presidential election occurs. Each memorandum of understanding shall include an agreement that the eligible candidate will implement and enforce an ethics plan to guide the conduct of the transition beginning on the date on which the candidate becomes the President-elect. The ethics plan shall include a description of the ethics requirements that will apply to all transition team members; a description of how the transition team will address the role on the team of registered lobbyists, former registered lobbyists, persons registered under the Foreign Agents Registration Act, foreign nationals, other foreign agents, and transition team members with sources of income or clients that are not disclosed to the public; a Code of Ethical Conduct, to which each transition team member will sign and be subject to, that reflects the content of the ethics plans and that meets other specified requirements; and a description of how the transition team will enforce the Code of Ethical Conduct.
Title
Transition Team Ethics Improvement Act
Sponsors
Rep. Elijah Cummings [D-MD] | Rep. Carolyn Maloney [D-NY] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Lacy Clay [D-MO] |
Rep. Stephen Lynch [D-MA] | Rep. Jim Cooper [D-TN] | Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA] | Rep. Harley Rouda [D-CA] |
Rep. Katie Hill [D-CA] | Rep. John Sarbanes [D-MD] | Sen. Peter Welch [D-VT] | Rep. Jackie Speier [D-CA] |
Rep. Mark DeSaulnier [D-CA] | Rep. Brenda Lawrence [D-MI] | Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA] | Rep. Jimmy Gomez [D-CA] |
Rep. Alexandria Ocasio-Cortez [D-NY] | Rep. Ayanna Pressley [D-MA] | Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-27 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 306. |
2020-01-27 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Oversight and Reform. H. Rept. 116-382. |
2019-03-26 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 18 - 12. |
2019-03-26 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-02-05 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform. |
2019-02-05 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB1 (Related) 2019-03-14 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 39.
SB338 (Related) 2019-02-05 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
SB394 (Related) 2020-03-03 - Became Public Law No: 116-121. (TXT | PDF)
HR172 (Similar To) 2019-03-06 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB1612 (Related) 2019-04-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
SB949 (Related) 2019-03-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB338 (Related) 2019-02-05 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
SB394 (Related) 2020-03-03 - Became Public Law No: 116-121. (TXT | PDF)
HR172 (Similar To) 2019-03-06 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB1612 (Related) 2019-04-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
SB949 (Related) 2019-03-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
Congressional oversight
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Federal officials
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Government information and archives
Government operations and politics
Intelligence activities, surveillance, classified information
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
Public participation and lobbying
Wages and earnings
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Federal officials
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Government information and archives
Government operations and politics
Intelligence activities, surveillance, classified information
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
Public participation and lobbying
Wages and earnings