US HB960 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-4)
Status: Passed on March 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-11 - Became Public Law No: 117-93.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-4)
Status: Passed on March 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-11 - Became Public Law No: 117-93.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 3493 Burnet Avenue in Cincinnati, Ohio, as the John H. Leahr and Herbert M. Heilbrun Post Office.
Title
To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 3493 Burnet Avenue in Cincinnati, Ohio, as the John H. Leahr and Herbert M. Heilbrun Post Office.
Sponsors
Rep. Brad Wenstrup [R-OH] | Rep. Steve Chabot [R-OH] | Rep. Joyce Beatty [D-OH] | Rep. Jim Jordan [R-OH] |
Rep. Robert Latta [R-OH] | Rep. Bill Johnson [R-OH] | Rep. Bob Gibbs [R-OH] | Rep. Warren Davidson [R-OH] |
Rep. Marcy Kaptur [D-OH] | Rep. Michael Turner [R-OH] | Rep. Troy Balderson [R-OH] | Rep. Tim Ryan [D-OH] |
Rep. David Joyce [R-OH] | Rep. Steve Stivers [R-OH] | Rep. Anthony Gonzalez [R-OH] | Rep. Marcia Fudge [D-OH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-11 | House | Became Public Law No: 117-93. |
2022-03-11 | House | Signed by President. |
2022-03-02 | House | Presented to President. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S723) |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 262. |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Peters without amendment. Without written report. |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2021-10-21 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2021-10-20 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2021-10-20 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5697) |
2021-10-20 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 960. |
2021-10-20 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5697-5698) |
2021-10-20 | House | Mrs. Maloney, Carolyn B. moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2021-04-14 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2021-04-14 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2021-02-08 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform. |
2021-02-08 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB3482 (Same As) 2022-01-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.