US HB959 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 84-21-1)
Status: Engrossed on July 24 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-07-24 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 24 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-07-24 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Title VIII Nursing Workforce Reauthorization Act of 2018 This bill amends the Public Health Service Act to extend through FY2022 support for nursing workforce programs and grants. Eligibility for advanced nursing education grants is expanded to include education programs for clinical nurse leaders and all combined registered nurse and graduate degree programs. (Clinical nurse leaders are advanced generalist clinicians who apply research and coordinate care in order to improve outcomes for patients.) To be eligible for these grants, clinical nurse specialist programs must provide registered nurses with full-time clinical nurse specialist education that qualifies the nurses to provide a full range of care. Programs for loan repayment and scholarships for nurses, loans for nursing faculty, and geriatric care education are extended through FY2022. Grants for increasing nursing workforce diversity are also extended through FY2022. Nurse education, practice, and quality grants are extended through FY2022 and eligibility is expanded to include nurse-managed health clinics. Grants for nursing career ladder programs are expanded to: (1) promote career advancement for individuals to become registered nurses or advanced education nurses; and (2) support internships and residency programs to encourage mentoring and the development of specialties.
Title
Title VIII Nursing Workforce Reauthorization Act of 2018
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-24 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. |
2018-07-23 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-07-23 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6605-6607) |
2018-07-23 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 959. |
2018-07-23 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6605-6608) |
2018-07-23 | House | Mr. Burgess moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2018-07-12 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2018-07-12 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2018-06-27 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote . |
2018-06-27 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-02-10 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2017-02-07 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2017-02-07 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1109 (Same As) 2017-05-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Subjects
Aging
Education programs funding
Health
Health facilities and institutions
Health personnel
Health programs administration and funding
Medical education
Nursing
Student aid and college costs
Education programs funding
Health
Health facilities and institutions
Health personnel
Health programs administration and funding
Medical education
Nursing
Student aid and college costs