US HB945 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 97-24)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-09-09 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Mental Health Access Improvement Act of 2019 This bill provides for coverage of marriage and family therapist services and mental health counselor services under Medicare. It also excludes such services from the skilled nursing facility prospective payment system, and authorizes marriage and family therapists and mental health counselors to develop discharge plans for post-hospital services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mental Health Access Improvement Act of 2019

Sponsors

Rep. Mike Thompson [D-CA]Rep. John Katko [R-NY]Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR]Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC]
Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA]Rep. Chellie Pingree [D-ME]Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA]Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY]
Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR]Rep. Ron Kind [D-WI]Rep. Debbie Mucarsel-Powell [D-FL]Rep. Cindy Axne [D-IA]
Rep. Seth Moulton [D-MA]Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA]Rep. Bobby Rush [D-IL]Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL]
Rep. Abby Finkenauer [D-IA]Rep. Pete Aguilar [D-CA]Rep. Elijah Cummings [D-MD]Rep. Kevin Hern [R-OK]
Rep. Markwayne Mullin [R-OK]Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA]Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA]Rep. Henry Johnson [D-GA]
Rep. John Rutherford [R-FL]Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD]Rep. Susan Davis [D-CA]Rep. Bennie Thompson [D-MS]
Rep. Joseph Morelle [D-NY]Rep. Andy Levin [D-MI]Rep. Lisa Rochester [D-DE]Rep. Jared Golden [D-ME]
Rep. Peter Welch [D-VT]Rep. Vicky Hartzler [R-MO]Rep. Julia Brownley [D-CA]Rep. Ruben Gallego [D-AZ]
Rep. Paul Tonko [D-NY]Rep. Vern Buchanan [R-FL]Rep. David Trone [D-MD]Rep. Elise Stefanik [R-NY]
Rep. Sharice Davids [D-KS]Rep. Mary Gay Scanlon [D-PA]Rep. Rodney Davis [R-IL]Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH]
Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA]Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX]Rep. Harley Rouda [D-CA]Rep. Joyce Beatty [D-OH]
Rep. Josh Harder [D-CA]Rep. Antonio Delgado [D-NY]Rep. Kendra Horn [D-OK]Rep. Gil Cisneros [D-CA]
Rep. Ed Perlmutter [D-CO]Rep. Judy Chu [D-CA]Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA]Rep. Mark Pocan [D-WI]
Rep. Joseph Neguse [D-CO]Rep. Bonnie Coleman [D-NJ]Rep. Al Lawson [D-FL]Rep. Morgan Griffith [R-VA]
Rep. Pramila Jayapal [D-WA]Rep. Anthony Brindisi [D-NY]Rep. James Himes [D-CT]Rep. Denver Riggleman [R-VA]
Rep. Jeff Fortenberry [R-NE]Rep. Christopher Pappas [D-NH]Rep. Karen Bass [D-CA]Rep. Nydia Velazquez [D-NY]
Rep. Cathy McMorris Rodgers [R-WA]Rep. Doris Matsui [D-CA]Rep. Adam Schiff [D-CA]Rep. Brian Higgins [D-NY]
Rep. Chris Collins [R-NY]Rep. Steve King [R-IA]Rep. Ayanna Pressley [D-MA]Rep. Collin Peterson [D-MN]
Rep. Mark Amodei [R-NV]Rep. William Keating [D-MA]Rep. Greg Gianforte [R-MT]Rep. Dwight Evans [D-PA]
Rep. James McGovern [D-MA]Rep. Linda Sanchez [D-CA]Rep. Tim Ryan [D-OH]Rep. Donald Payne [D-NJ]
Rep. Jason Crow [D-CO]Rep. Chrissy Houlahan [D-PA]Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV]Rep. Robert Wittman [R-VA]
Rep. Pete Stauber [R-MN]Rep. Elissa Slotkin [D-MI]Rep. John Larson [D-CT]Rep. C.A. Ruppersberger [D-MD]
Rep. Robin Kelly [D-IL]Rep. Daniel Kildee [D-MI]Rep. Paul Cook [R-CA]Rep. Steve Stivers [R-OH]
Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL]Rep. Joseph Kennedy [D-MA]Rep. Grace Meng [D-NY]Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN]
Rep. Rashida Tlaib [D-MI]Rep. Abigail Spanberger [D-VA]Rep. Sam Graves [R-MO]Rep. Matthew Cartwright [D-PA]
Rep. Tom O'Halleran [D-AZ]Rep. Lance Gooden [R-TX]Rep. Susan Wild [D-PA]Rep. Rebecca Sherrill [D-NJ]
Rep. Raul Ruiz [D-CA]Rep. Max Rose [D-NY]Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA]Rep. Michael Simpson [R-ID]
Rep. Tulsi Gabbard [D-HI]Rep. Suzanne Bonamici [D-OR]Rep. Katie Porter [D-CA]Rep. Stephanie Murphy [D-FL]
Rep. Frederica Wilson [D-FL]Rep. Jesus Garcia [D-IL]Rep. Denny Heck [D-WA]Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI]
Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-09HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
2020-09-09HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2020-06-30HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
2019-02-01HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
2019-01-31HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-01-31HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-01-31HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
2019-01-31HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB286 (Same As) 2019-01-31 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback