US HB941 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Seapower and Projection Forces.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Seapower and Projection Forces Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Seapower and Projection Forces.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Seapower and Projection Forces Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
12 Carrier Act This bill requires the Navy's naval combat forces to include at least 12 (currently, 11) operational aircraft carriers, effective September 30, 2023. The bill amends the National Defense Authorization Act for Fiscal Year 2016 to eliminate the requirement that the Navy's certification to the congressional defense committees must indicate that the full ship shock trials on the U.S.S. Gerald R. Ford will be conducted before the first deployment of such ship.
Title
12 Carrier Act
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Conaway [R-TX] | Rep. Elise Stefanik [R-NY] | Rep. Vicky Hartzler [R-MO] | Rep. Jim Bridenstine [R-OK] |
Rep. Jim Banks [R-IN] | Rep. Mike Gallagher [R-WI] | Rep. Duncan Hunter [R-CA] |
Roll Calls
Senate - On the Cloture Motion S.Amdt. 1003 to H.R. 2810 (National Defense Authorization Act for Fiscal Year 2018) (Y: 84 N: 9 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - On Cloture on the Motion to Proceed H.R. 2810 (Y: 89 N: 3 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - On Cloture on the Motion to Proceed H.R. 2810 (Y: 89 N: 3 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-23 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Seapower and Projection Forces. |
2017-02-07 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services. |
2017-02-07 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB2810 (Related) 2017-12-12 - Became Public Law No: 115-91. (TXT | PDF)
HR616 (Similar To) 2017-11-14 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB5515 (Related) 2018-08-13 - Became Public Law No: 115-232.
HR1019 (Similar To) 2018-07-24 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR616 (Similar To) 2017-11-14 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB5515 (Related) 2018-08-13 - Became Public Law No: 115-232.
HR1019 (Similar To) 2018-07-24 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Military procurement, research, weapons development
Military readiness
Military procurement, research, weapons development
Military readiness