US HB937 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-21 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Research and Technology.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Research and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-21 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Research and Technology.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Research and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
American Textile Technology Innovation and Research for Exportation (ATTIRE) Act - Directs the Secretary of Commerce to establish a grant program to fund textile research and innovation in the U.S. textile and fiber products industry and to promote increased U.S. textile exports. Limits eligibility under such grant program to institutions of higher education and not-for-profit research institutions, including not-for-profit industry associations whose mission is to support textile research and innovation. Gives preference in the award of such grants to collaborative research organizations that emphasize peer-reviewed research by leading academic and industry experts. Requires grant funds to be used for research and development activities that achieve at least one of the goals described in this Act, including to: (1) build and sustain innovation and competitiveness in the U.S. textile industry, (2) contribute to transforming the U.S. textile and apparel industry into a highly flexible supply chain, and (3) facilitate the creation of domestic jobs in the textile industry.
Title
American Textile Technology Innovation and Research for Exportation (ATTIRE) Act
Sponsors
Rep. David Price [D-NC] | Rep. Howard Coble [R-NC] | Rep. Elizabeth Esty [D-CT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-21 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Research and Technology. |
2013-03-15 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Terrorism, Nonproliferation, and Trade. |
2013-03-07 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Trade. |
2013-03-04 | House | Referred to House Foreign Affairs |
2013-03-04 | House | Referred to House Ways and Means |
2013-03-04 | House | Referred to House Science, Space, and Technology |
2013-03-04 | House | Referred to the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, and Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Subjects
Advanced technology and technological innovations
Competitiveness, trade promotion, trade deficits
Education programs funding
Higher education
Industrial policy and productivity
Manufacturing
Product development and innovation
Research administration and funding
Research and development
Science, technology, communications
Technology transfer and commercialization
Competitiveness, trade promotion, trade deficits
Education programs funding
Higher education
Industrial policy and productivity
Manufacturing
Product development and innovation
Research administration and funding
Research and development
Science, technology, communications
Technology transfer and commercialization
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/937/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr937/BILLS-113hr937ih.pdf |