US HB933 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Removes short-barreled rifles (barrels of less than 16 inches in length) from the definition of firearms for purposes of the National Firearms Act. It also eliminates the prohibition on the transportation of such rifles in interstate commerce and treats persons who acquire or possess a short-barreled rifle as meeting the registration or licensing requirements for such rifle where such requirements are determined by reference to the National Firearms Act. The bill preempts state or local laws that impose a tax or recordkeeping requirements on short-barreled rifles. The Department of Justice must destroy records relating to the registration of certain rifles within one year after the enactment of this bill.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Home Defense and Competitive Shooting Act of 2021

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-23HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
2021-02-08HouseReferred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2021-02-08HouseReferred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2021-02-08HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB803 (Same As) 2021-03-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB1758 (Same As) 2021-05-18 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback