US HB925 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 13-5)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend title 38, United States Code, to clarify the eligibility for monthly stipends paid under the Post-9/11 Educational Assistance Program for certain members of the reserve components of the Armed Forces. This bill provides that the monthly stipend under the Post-9/11 Educational Assistance program for a member of the reserve components of the Armed Forces who is pursuing a program of education using assistance under such program and performing certain active duty service shall be payable on a pro rata basis for the period of such month in which the individual is not performing active duty service.
Title
To amend title 38, United States Code, to clarify the eligibility for monthly stipends paid under the Post-9/11 Educational Assistance Program for certain members of the reserve components of the Armed Forces.
Sponsors
Rep. Ken Calvert [R-CA] | Rep. Madeleine Bordallo [D-GU] | Rep. Bradley Byrne [R-AL] | Rep. Paul Cook [R-CA] |
Rep. Chris Collins [R-NY] | Sen. Kevin Cramer [R-ND] | Rep. John Garamendi [D-CA] | Rep. Darrell Issa [R-CA] |
Rep. Lynn Jenkins [R-KS] | Rep. Walter Jones [R-NC] | Rep. David Joyce [R-OH] | Rep. Chellie Pingree [D-ME] |
Rep. Tom McClintock [R-CA] | Rep. Tim Ryan [D-OH] | Rep. Elise Stefanik [R-NY] | Rep. Timothy Walz [D-MN] |
Rep. Robert Wittman [R-VA] | Rep. Bob Goodlatte [R-VA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-03 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity. |
2017-02-07 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2017-02-07 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB473 (Related) 2017-06-15 - Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Hearings held.
HB3218 (Related) 2017-08-16 - Became Public Law No: 115-48. (TXT | PDF)
HB3218 (Related) 2017-08-16 - Became Public Law No: 115-48. (TXT | PDF)
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
National Guard and reserves
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
National Guard and reserves
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/925/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr925/BILLS-115hr925ih.pdf |