US HB923 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-7)
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-28 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-28 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To support the independence, sovereignty, and territorial integrity of Georgia, and for other purposes.
Title
Georgia Support Act
Sponsors
Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA] | Rep. Adam Kinzinger [R-IL] | Rep. Marcy Kaptur [D-OH] | Rep. Carol Miller [R-WV] |
Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] | Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV] | Rep. Alexander Mooney [R-WV] | Rep. Dan Crenshaw [R-TX] |
Rep. Andy Harris [R-MD] | Rep. Bryan Steil [R-WI] | Rep. John Rose [R-TN] | Rep. Kelly Armstrong [R-ND] |
Rep. Steve Chabot [R-OH] | Rep. Tim Walberg [R-MI] | Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] |
Rep. Brad Sherman [D-CA] | Rep. William Keating [D-MA] | Rep. Steve Womack [R-AR] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-27 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended (Y: 406 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-28 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. |
2022-04-27 | House | The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection. |
2022-04-27 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2022-04-27 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 406 - 20 (Roll no. 131). (text: CR H4532-4534) |
2022-04-27 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H4555-4556) |
2022-04-27 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2022-04-27 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 923. |
2022-04-27 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4532-4536) |
2022-04-27 | House | Mr. Connolly moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2022-04-05 | House | Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute by Voice Vote. |
2022-04-05 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2021-04-23 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship. |
2021-02-08 | House | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2021-02-08 | House | Introduced in House |