US HB910 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-02 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Fair Access to Investment Research Act of 2017 This bill directs the Securities and Exchange Commission (SEC) to establish and implement a "safe harbor" for certain investment fund research reports published by brokers and dealers. Such reports shall be deemed not to be "offers" under specified provisions of securities law, even if the broker or dealer participates in the registered offering of the investment fund's securities. In implementing the safe harbor, the SEC must prohibit a self-regulatory organization from maintaining or enforcing a rule that would prevent a member from: (1) publishing or distributing a covered investment fund research report solely because the member is also participating in a registered offering of the fund, or (2) participating in a registered offering of a covered investment fund solely because the member has published a research report about the fund. The bill restricts the SEC from conditioning the safe harbor upon specified requirements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Fair Access to Investment Research Act of 2017

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-01 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass, as Amended (Y: 405 N: 2 NV: 23 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-02SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
2017-05-01HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2017-05-01HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 405 - 2 (Roll no. 237). (text: CR H2978-2979)
2017-05-01HouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H2987-2988)
2017-05-01HouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
2017-05-01HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 910.
2017-05-01HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2978-2980)
2017-05-01HouseMr. Hill moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
2017-05-01HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 59.
2017-05-01HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 115-102.
2017-03-09HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 56 - 2.
2017-03-09HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. Markup report CQ
2017-02-07HouseReferred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
2017-02-07HouseIntroduced in House

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback