US HB908 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-09-19 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 139.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-09-19 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 139.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Full Implementation of the Chemical Facility Anti-Terrorism Standards Act - Amends the Department of Homeland Security Appropriations Act, 2007 to extend until October 4, 2018, the authority of the Secretary of Homeland Security (DHS) to issue interim final regulations establishing risk-based performance standards for security of chemical facilities and requiring vulnerability assessments and the development and implementation of site security plans for such facilities. Exempts an individual holding a valid transportation security card from a security background check under such standards. Directs the Secretary to determine, on an ongoing basis, whether alternate security background checks conducted by the Secretary are sufficient to meet the requirements of such standards. Allows the owner or operator of a chemical facility subject to such regulations to permit an individual holding a valid transportation security card or who has passed a qualifying alternate security background check to have access to restricted areas or critical assets of such facility without the satisfaction of any other additional requirements imposed by the Secretary.
Title
Full Implementation of the Chemical Facility Anti-Terrorism Standards Act
Sponsors
Rep. Tim Murphy [R-PA] | Rep. Jim Gerlach [R-PA] | Rep. Gene Green [D-TX] | Rep. Donald Manzullo [R-IL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-09-19 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 139. |
2011-09-19 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 112-211. |
2011-05-26 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 33 - 16. |
2011-05-26 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2011-05-25 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2011-05-04 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote . |
2011-05-04 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2011-03-11 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment and the Economy. |
2011-03-03 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
Same As/Similar To
HB916 (Related) 2011-03-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment and the Economy.
SB473 (Related) 2011-10-20 - By Senator Lieberman from Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs filed written report. Report No. 112-90.
SB473 (Related) 2011-10-20 - By Senator Lieberman from Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs filed written report. Report No. 112-90.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Department of Homeland Security
Emergency management
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Homeland security
Industrial facilities
Terrorism
Department of Homeland Security
Emergency management
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Homeland security
Industrial facilities
Terrorism