US HB880 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-27 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-27 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
MISSION ZERO Act Military Injury Surgical Systems Integrated Operationally Nationwide to Achieve ZERO Preventable Deaths Act (Sec. 2) This bill amends the Public Health Service Act to require the Department of Health and Human Services to award grants to certain trauma centers to enable military trauma care providers and trauma teams to provide trauma care and related acute care at those trauma centers. Funds may be used to train and incorporate military trauma care providers into the trauma center, including expenditures for malpractice insurance, office space, information technology, specialty education and supervision, trauma programs, and state license fees. Grantees must allow the military trauma care providers to be deployed for military operations, training, or response to a mass casualty incident.
Title
MISSION ZERO Act Military Injury Surgical Systems Integrated Operationally Nationwide to Achieve ZERO Preventable Deaths Act
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Burgess [R-TX] | Rep. Gene Green [D-TX] | Rep. Richard Hudson [R-NC] | Rep. Kathy Castor [D-FL] |
Rep. C.A. Ruppersberger [D-MD] | Rep. Brett Guthrie [R-KY] | Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA] | Rep. Donald Norcross [D-NJ] |
Rep. Mark Pocan [D-WI] | Rep. Carol Shea-Porter [D-NH] | Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] | Rep. Denny Heck [D-WA] |
Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR] | Rep. Filemon Vela [D-TX] | Rep. Timothy Walz [D-MN] | Rep. Garland Barr [R-KY] |
Rep. Bill Pascrell [D-NJ] | Rep. Gregg Harper [R-MS] | Rep. James Sensenbrenner [R-WI] | Rep. French Hill [R-AR] |
Rep. Pramila Jayapal [D-WA] | Rep. Doris Matsui [D-CA] | Rep. Gus Bilirakis [R-FL] | Rep. Lynn Jenkins [R-KS] |
Rep. Tim Walberg [R-MI] | Rep. Adam Kinzinger [R-IL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-27 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. |
2018-02-26 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-02-26 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H1236-1237) |
2018-02-26 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 880. |
2018-02-26 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1236-1238) |
2018-02-26 | House | Mr. Burgess moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2017-09-25 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 240. |
2017-09-25 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 115-330. |
2017-07-27 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2017-07-27 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-06-29 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote . |
2017-06-29 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-02-10 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2017-02-06 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2017-02-06 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1022 (Same As) 2017-05-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HB6378 (Related) 2018-09-26 - Received in the Senate.
HB7328 (Related) 2018-12-20 - Received in the Senate.
HB6378 (Related) 2018-09-26 - Received in the Senate.
HB7328 (Related) 2018-12-20 - Received in the Senate.
Subjects
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Health
Health facilities and institutions
Health programs administration and funding
Medical education
Medical research
Military education and training
Military medicine
Military operations and strategy
Military readiness
Health
Health facilities and institutions
Health programs administration and funding
Medical education
Medical research
Military education and training
Military medicine
Military operations and strategy
Military readiness