US HB875 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on December 16 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-16 - Became Public Law No: 114-279.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on December 16 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-16 - Became Public Law No: 114-279.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Cross-Border Trade Enhancement Act of 2016 Authorizes the Commissioner of U.S. Customs and Border Protection (CBP) to enter into agreements with certain persons for the CBP to provide customs, agricultural processing, border security, or inspection-related immigration services at a land border port of entry, subject to payment of a fee to reimburse the CBP for providing such services. Authorizes the Commissioner and the Administrator of General Services (GSA) to: enter into cost-sharing or reimbursement agreements with persons for the construction or maintenance of a new or existing CBP or GSA facility or other infrastructure at a land border port of entry; or accept donations from persons of real or personal property (including money) or nonpersonal services for use in the construction or maintenance of such facilities or infrastructure. Directs the Commissioner to issue procedures for evaluating a proposal submitted by a person for an agreement.
Title
Cross-Border Trade Enhancement Act of 2016
Sponsors
Rep. Henry Cuellar [D-TX] | Rep. Will Hurd [R-TX] | Rep. Beto O'Rourke [D-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-16 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 114-279. |
2016-12-16 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2016-12-14 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2016-12-12 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2016-12-10 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7149) |
2016-12-07 | Senate | Received in the Senate, read twice. |
2016-12-06 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2016-12-06 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7215-7218) |
2016-12-06 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 875. |
2016-12-06 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7215-7220) |
2016-12-06 | House | Mr. Boustany moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2015-03-16 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security. |
2015-02-27 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Trade. |
2015-02-27 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Biotechnology, Horticulture, and Research. |
2015-02-25 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Border and Maritime Security. |
2015-02-12 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management. |
2015-02-11 | House | Referred to House Agriculture |
2015-02-11 | House | Referred to House Homeland Security |
2015-02-11 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2015-02-11 | House | Referred to House Transportation and Infrastructure |
2015-02-11 | House | Referred to House Ways and Means |
2015-02-11 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Transportation and Infrastructure, the Judiciary, Homeland Security, and Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2015-02-11 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB208 (Related) 2015-01-21 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
SB461 (Same As) 2016-11-30 - Held at the desk.
SB461 (Same As) 2016-11-30 - Held at the desk.
Subjects
Agricultural trade
Border security and unlawful immigration
Customs enforcement
Department of Homeland Security
Executive agency funding and structure
Foreign trade and international finance
Public contracts and procurement
User charges and fees
Border security and unlawful immigration
Customs enforcement
Department of Homeland Security
Executive agency funding and structure
Foreign trade and international finance
Public contracts and procurement
User charges and fees