US HB873 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-18 - Became Public Law No: 115-51. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Global War on Terrorism War Memorial Act (Sec. 2) This bill allows the Global War on Terror Memorial Foundation to establish the National Global War on Terrorism Memorial as a commemorative work on federal land in the District of Columbia to commemorate and honor the members of the Armed Forces who served on active duty in support of the Global War on Terrorism. The memorial shall be established in accordance with the Commemorative Works Act. The bill prohibits the use of federal funds to pay any expenses for the establishment of the memorial. The Foundation shall be solely responsible for accepting contributions and paying expenses to establish the memorial. If, upon payment of all expenses for the establishment of the memorial or upon the expiration of the legislative authority for the memorial, there remains a balance of funds that was received to establish it, the Foundation shall transmit such funds to the Department of the Interior for deposit into the National Park Foundation account.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Global War on Terrorism War Memorial Act

Sponsors

Rep. Mike Gallagher [R]Rep. Seth Moulton [D]Rep. Stephen Knight [R]Rep. Ann Wagner [R]
Rep. Kevin Yoder [R]Rep. Martha McSally [R]Rep. Ruben Gallego [D]Rep. Bill Huizenga [R]
Rep. Jeb Hensarling [R]Rep. Denny Heck [D]Rep. Walter Jones [R]Rep. Tim Ryan [D]
Rep. Barry Loudermilk [R]Rep. Timothy Walz [D]Rep. Beto O'Rourke [D]Rep. James McGovern [D]
Rep. Richard Neal [D]Rep. Jacky Rosen [D]Rep. Tulsi Gabbard [D]Rep. Robert Wittman [R]
Rep. David Valadao [R]Rep. Glenn Grothman [R]Rep. Louise Slaughter [D]Rep. Steve Chabot [R]
Rep. Keith Ellison [D]Rep. Sean Duffy [R]Rep. Madeleine Bordallo [D]Rep. Bobby Rush [D]
Rep. Elise Stefanik [R]Rep. Sean Maloney [D]Rep. Dan Newhouse [R]Rep. Markwayne Mullin [R]
Rep. Eric Swalwell [D]Rep. Sanford Bishop [D]Rep. Ann Kuster [D]Rep. Steve Stivers [R]
Rep. Sam Graves [R]Rep. Charles Fleischmann [R]Rep. Robert Pittenger [R]Rep. Trent Franks [R]
Rep. Bill Flores [R]Rep. Glenn Thompson [R]Rep. John Delaney [D]Rep. Doug LaMalfa [R]
Rep. John Katko [R]Rep. Keith Rothfus [R]Rep. Liz Cheney [R]Rep. Michael Doyle [D]
Rep. Brad Sherman [D]Rep. Ted Budd [R]Rep. Vicente Gonzalez [D]Rep. Jack Bergman [R]
Rep. Bradley Byrne [R]Rep. Tim Murphy [R]Rep. Peter King [R]Rep. Lynn Jenkins [R]
Rep. Bruce Westerman [R]Rep. Scott Taylor [R]Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R]Rep. Ron Kind [D]
Rep. Brett Guthrie [R]Rep. Erik Paulsen [R]Rep. Sam Johnson [R]Rep. Daniel Donovan [?]
Rep. Julia Brownley [D]Rep. Mike Bost [R]Rep. Ted Lieu [D]Rep. Matthew Cartwright [D]
Rep. Mark Pocan [D]Rep. David Loebsack [D]Rep. Ami Bera [D]Rep. Bill Foster [D]
Rep. Jody Hice [R]Rep. Brian Babin [R]Rep. Doug Lamborn [R]Rep. Ken Calvert [R]
Rep. David McKinley [R]Rep. Darrell Issa [R]Rep. Christopher Smith [R]Rep. C.A. Ruppersberger [D]
Rep. Daniel Webster [R]Rep. Mike Kelly [R]Rep. Ron Estes [R]Rep. Jim Banks [R]
Rep. Don Bacon [R]Rep. Sander Levin [D]Rep. Tom Rice [R]Rep. Robert Latta [R]
Rep. Robert Brady [D]Rep. Neal Dunn [R]Rep. James Sensenbrenner [R]Rep. Barbara Comstock [R]
Rep. Frank LoBiondo [R]Rep. Michael Capuano [D]Rep. Charles Dent [R]Rep. Bruce Poliquin [R]
Rep. Carlos Curbelo [R]Rep. Steven Palazzo [R]Rep. Suzan DelBene [D]Rep. Randy Weber [R]
Rep. John Moolenaar [R]Rep. Claudia Tenney [R]Rep. Jason Lewis [R]Rep. Adam Kinzinger [R]
Rep. Chris Collins [R]Rep. Josh Gottheimer [D]Rep. Drew Ferguson [R]Rep. Thomas Suozzi [D]
Rep. Krysten Sinema [D]Rep. Vicky Hartzler [R]Rep. Katherine Clark [D]Rep. Emanuel Cleaver [D]
Rep. Stephen Lynch [D]Rep. Juan Vargas [D]Rep. Joaquin Castro [D]Rep. Rosa DeLauro [D]
Rep. Gene Green [D]Rep. Peter Roskam [R]Rep. Andre Carson [D]Rep. John Yarmuth [D]
Rep. Ron DeSantis [R]Rep. Scott Perry [R]Rep. Jose Serrano [D]Rep. Frank Pallone [D]
Rep. Mike Bishop [R]Rep. Brian Mast [R]Rep. Joe Wilson [R]Rep. Thomas Garrett [R]
Rep. Kevin Brady [R]Rep. Chellie Pingree [D]Rep. Luis Correa [D]Rep. Darin LaHood [R]
Rep. Don Young [R]Rep. Thomas Rooney [R]Rep. Yvette Clarke [D]Rep. Kathleen Rice [D]
Rep. Tom Reed [R]Rep. James Renacci [R]Rep. Lou Barletta [R]Rep. Jimmy Panetta [D]
Rep. Greg Gianforte [R]Rep. Kristi Noem [R]Rep. William Keating [D]Rep. John Ratcliffe [R]
Rep. Brad Wenstrup [R]Rep. Daniel Lipinski [D]Rep. Mark Takano [D]Rep. Jackie Walorski [R]
Rep. Tom Marino [R]Rep. Brenda Lawrence [D]Rep. Donald Payne [D]Rep. Earl Carter [R]
Rep. Mike Quigley [D]Rep. Ralph Abraham [R]Rep. Jaime Herrera Beutler [R]Rep. Dwight Evans [D]
Rep. Joyce Beatty [D]Rep. Stephanie Murphy [D]Rep. Jackie Speier [D]Rep. Luke Messer [R]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-18SenateBecame Public Law No: 115-51. (TXT | PDF)
2017-08-18SenateSigned by President.
2017-08-07SenatePresented to President.
2017-08-04SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
2017-08-03SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4895-4896)
2017-07-31SenateReceived in the Senate, read twice.
2017-07-28HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2017-07-28HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6543-6544)
2017-07-28HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 873.
2017-07-28HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6543-6547)
2017-07-28HouseMr. McClintock moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
2017-07-28HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 190.
2017-07-28HouseReported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-264.
2017-07-26HouseOrdered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
2017-07-26HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2017-07-14HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
2017-02-17HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
2017-02-06HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
2017-02-06HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB926 (Same As) 2017-07-19 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback