US HB864 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-4)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-02-09 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Environment.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Energy and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-02-09 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Environment.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Energy and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Renewable Fuel Pipelines Act of 2009 - Amends the Energy Policy Act of 2005 to allow federally-guaranteed loans for renewable fuel pipeline construction without regard to whether an appropriation for the cost has been made. Includes ethanol and biodiesel as renewable fuel. Allows a maximum guarantee by the Secretary of Energy of 90% of the project cost and more than one guarantee for a project (as long as the total guaranteed amount does not exceed 90%). Sets forth factors to be considered in guarantee determinations, including volume and quality of fuel, size of markets served, experience of the entity working with renewable fuel, and associated storage, production, and terminal facilities. Authorizes an entity implementing a fuel pipeline project for which a guarantee is made, when such entity is unable to acquire the necessary right-of-way to construct, operate, and maintain pipelines and the necessary land or property for the location of pump stations, pressure apparatus, and other necessary facilities or equipment by contract, to acquire what is necessary through eminent domain if determined by the Secretary to be necessary or desirable in the public interest. Authorizes the Secretary to provide grants for renewable fuel pipeline projects to assist in carrying out permit acquisition, planning, and other preparatory activities in advance of participation in the guarantee program. Limits the sum of grants and amounts guaranteed for a project that receives both to 90% of the project's cost.
Title
Renewable Fuel Pipelines Act of 2009
Sponsors
Rep. Leonard Boswell [D-IA] | Rep. Bruce Braley [D-IA] | Rep. Bill Foster [D-IL] | Rep. Phil Hare [D-IL] |
Rep. Stephanie Herseth Sandlin [D-SD] | Rep. Tim Holden [D-PA] | Rep. Steve King [R-IA] | Rep. Tom Latham [R-IA] |
Rep. David Loebsack [D-IA] | Rep. Mike McIntyre [D-NC] | Rep. Collin Peterson [D-MN] | Rep. Aaron Schock [R-IL] |
Rep. Lee Terry [R-NE] | Rep. Timothy Walz [D-MN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-02-09 | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Environment. | |
2009-02-05 | Referred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials. | |
2009-02-04 | Referred to House Transportation and Infrastructure | |
2009-02-04 | Referred to House Energy and Commerce | |
2009-02-04 | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Same As/Similar To
SB828 (Related) 2009-04-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Alternative and renewable resources
Department of Energy
Energy
Government lending and loan guarantees
Pipelines
Transportation programs funding
Alternative and renewable resources
Department of Energy
Energy
Government lending and loan guarantees
Pipelines
Transportation programs funding
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/111th-congress/house-bill/864/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/111/bills/hr864/BILLS-111hr864ih.pdf |