US HB8588 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on July 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, and the Internet.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, And The Internet Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, and the Internet.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, And The Internet Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To address the high costs of health care services, prescription drugs, and health insurance coverage in the United States, and for other purposes.
Title
Fair Care Act of 2022
Sponsors
Rep. Bruce Westerman [R-AR] | Rep. Anthony Gonzalez [R-OH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, and the Internet. |
2022-11-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties. |
2022-11-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Antitrust, Commercial, and Administrative Law. |
2022-07-28 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Education and Labor, the Judiciary, Oversight and Reform, Rules, the Budget, Armed Services, and House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2022-07-28 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB742 (Related) 2021-02-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB892 (Related) 2021-02-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB1330 (Related) 2021-02-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB1776 (Related) 2021-05-18 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Antitrust, Commercial, and Administrative Law.
HB2831 (Related) 2021-04-27 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB3761 (Related) 2021-06-09 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB3918 (Related) 2021-06-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Consumer Protection and Commerce.
HB4301 (Related) 2021-07-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB4417 (Related) 2021-07-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB4547 (Related) 2021-07-20 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
HB5365 (Related) 2021-09-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB7828 (Related) 2022-05-18 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
HB7831 (Related) 2022-05-18 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB8408 (Related) 2022-07-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials.
SB68 (Related) 2021-01-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
SB128 (Related) 2021-01-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB322 (Related) 2021-02-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB562 (Related) 2021-03-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB896 (Related) 2021-03-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB1644 (Related) 2021-05-13 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB2327 (Related) 2021-07-13 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB4011 (Related) 2022-04-06 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB4310 (Related) 2022-05-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB8984 (Related) 2022-09-27 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB892 (Related) 2021-02-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB1330 (Related) 2021-02-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB1776 (Related) 2021-05-18 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Antitrust, Commercial, and Administrative Law.
HB2831 (Related) 2021-04-27 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB3761 (Related) 2021-06-09 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB3918 (Related) 2021-06-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Consumer Protection and Commerce.
HB4301 (Related) 2021-07-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB4417 (Related) 2021-07-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB4547 (Related) 2021-07-20 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
HB5365 (Related) 2021-09-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB7828 (Related) 2022-05-18 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
HB7831 (Related) 2022-05-18 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB8408 (Related) 2022-07-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials.
SB68 (Related) 2021-01-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
SB128 (Related) 2021-01-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB322 (Related) 2021-02-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB562 (Related) 2021-03-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB896 (Related) 2021-03-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB1644 (Related) 2021-05-13 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB2327 (Related) 2021-07-13 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB4011 (Related) 2022-04-06 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB4310 (Related) 2022-05-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB8984 (Related) 2022-09-27 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/8588/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr8588/BILLS-117hr8588ih.pdf |