US HB8487 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on July 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-30 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 512.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-30 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 512.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend title XVIII of the Social Security Act to establish requirements with respect to the use of prior authorization under Medicare Advantage plans, and for other purposes.
Title
Improving Seniors’ Timely Access to Care Act of 2022
Sponsors
Rep. Suzan DelBene [D-WA] | Rep. Mike Kelly [R-PA] | Rep. Ami Bera [D-CA] | Rep. Larry Bucshon [R-IN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-30 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 512. |
2022-12-30 | House | Committee on Energy and Commerce discharged. |
2022-12-30 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 117-696, Part I. |
2022-07-27 | House | Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2022-07-27 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2022-07-26 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2022-07-26 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB3173 (Related) 2022-09-15 - Received in the Senate.
SB3018 (Related) 2021-10-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB3018 (Related) 2021-10-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.