US HB8466 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on October 11 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-10-11 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 11 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-10-11 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To require the head of each agency to establish a plan relating to the safety of Federal employees and contractors physically present at certain worksites during a nationwide public health emergency declared for an infectious disease, and for other purposes.
Title
Chai Suthammanont Healthy Federal Workplaces Act of 2022
Sponsors
Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA] | Rep. Carolyn Maloney [D-NY] | Rep. Shontel Brown [D-OH] |
Roll Calls
2022-09-29 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended (Y: 351 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-11 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2022-09-29 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2022-09-29 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 351 - 73 (Roll no. 462). (text: CR H8140-8141) |
2022-09-29 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H8270-8271) |
2022-09-28 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2022-09-28 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 8466. |
2022-09-28 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8140-8143) |
2022-09-28 | House | Mrs. Maloney, Carolyn B. moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2022-09-20 | House | Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2022-09-20 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2022-07-21 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform. |
2022-07-21 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB978 (Related) 2021-09-29 - UNANIMOUS CONSENT REQUEST - Mr. DeSaulnier asked unanimous consent that the ordering of the yeas and nays on the motion that the House suspend the rules and pass the bill H.R. 978 be vacated, to the end that the motion be considered as withdrawn. Agreed to without objection.
SB2343 (Related) 2021-07-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
SB2343 (Related) 2021-07-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.