US HB8463 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-2)
Status: Engrossed on October 11 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-10-11 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 11 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-10-11 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To modify the requirements under the Millennium Challenge Act of 2003 for candidate countries, and for other purposes.
Title
Millennium Challenge Corporation Eligibility Expansion Act
Sponsors
Rep. Joaquin Castro [D-TX] | Rep. Young Kim [R-CA] | Rep. Gregory Meeks [D-NY] | Rep. Nicole Malliotakis [R-NY] |
Rep. Chrissy Houlahan [D-PA] | Rep. Karen Bass [D-CA] | Rep. Brad Sherman [D-CA] | Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV] |
Rep. Juan Vargas [D-CA] | Rep. Dean Phillips [D-MN] | Rep. William Keating [D-MA] | Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA] |
Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI] | Rep. Jim Costa [D-CA] | Rep. Ami Bera [D-CA] |
Roll Calls
2022-09-29 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill (Y: 334 N: 87 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-11 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. |
2022-09-29 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2022-09-29 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 334 - 87 (Roll no. 472). (text: CR H8198-8199) |
2022-09-29 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H8279-8280) |
2022-09-28 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2022-09-28 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 8463. |
2022-09-28 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8198-8200) |
2022-09-28 | House | Mr. Castro (TX) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2022-07-29 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 40 - 4. |
2022-07-28 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2022-07-21 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
2022-07-21 | House | Introduced in House |