US HB8449 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on July 20 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-07-29 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H7489)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 20 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-07-29 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H7489)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To establish and maintain a coordinated program within the National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration that improves wildfire, fire weather, fire risk, and smoke related forecasting, detection, modeling, observations, and service delivery, and to address growing needs in the wildland-urban interface, and for other purposes.
Title
Fire Ready Nation Act of 2022
Sponsors
Rep. Kim Schrier [D-WA] | Rep. Ami Bera [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-29 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H7489) |
2022-07-21 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment. |
2022-07-20 | House | Referred to the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology, and in addition to the Committees on Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2022-07-20 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB4237 (Related) 2022-12-15 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 662.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/8449/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr8449/BILLS-117hr8449ih.pdf |