US HB8446 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-14)
Status: Engrossed on October 11 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-10-11 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 11 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-10-11 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To modify and extend the Global Food Security Act of 2016.
Title
Global Food Security Reauthorization Act of 2022
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-09-29 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended (Y: 331 N: 95 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-11 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. |
2022-09-29 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2022-09-29 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 331 - 95 (Roll no. 471). (text: CR H8195-8196) |
2022-09-29 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H8278-8279) |
2022-09-28 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2022-09-28 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 8446. |
2022-09-28 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8195-8198) |
2022-09-28 | House | Mr. Castro (TX) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2022-09-14 | House | Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2022-09-14 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2022-07-20 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
2022-07-20 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB4649 (Related) 2022-07-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
HB7776 (Related) 2022-12-23 - Became Public Law No: 117-263.
HB7776 (Related) 2022-12-23 - Became Public Law No: 117-263.