US HB842 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-29 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
Pending: House Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-29 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
Pending: House Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Connecting Lobbyists and Electeds for Accountability and Reform Act or the CLEAR Act requires reports filed by political committees, reports filed by persons making independent expenditures, and reports filed by persons making disbursements for electioneering communications to disclose if individuals identified in the reports are registered lobbyists.
Title
CLEAR Act Connecting Lobbyists and Electeds for Accountability and Reform Act
Sponsors
Rep. Antonio Delgado [D-NY] | Rep. Katie Hill [D-CA] | Rep. Paul Tonko [D-NY] | Sen. Ben Lujan [D-NM] |
Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-29 | House | Referred to the House Committee on House Administration. |
2019-01-29 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB1 (Related) 2019-03-14 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 39.
HR172 (Similar To) 2019-03-06 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB547 (Same As) 2019-02-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
HB1612 (Related) 2019-04-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
SB949 (Related) 2019-03-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HR172 (Similar To) 2019-03-06 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB547 (Same As) 2019-02-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
HB1612 (Related) 2019-04-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
SB949 (Related) 2019-03-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
Congressional oversight
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Government information and archives
Government operations and politics
Public participation and lobbying
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Government information and archives
Government operations and politics
Public participation and lobbying
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/842/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr842/BILLS-116hr842ih.pdf |