US HB839 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-2)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-10 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
Pending: House Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-10 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
Pending: House Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Lena Horne Recognition Act Directs the Speaker of the House of Representatives and the President pro tempore of the Senate to arrange for the posthumous presentation of a Congressional Gold Medal in commemoration of Lena Horne in recognition of her achievements and contributions to American culture and the civil rights movement.
Title
Lena Horne Recognition Act
Sponsors
Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL] | Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY] | Rep. Niki Tsongas [D-MA] | Rep. John Yarmuth [D-KY] |
Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA] | Rep. Patrick Murphy [D-FL] | Rep. John Conyers [D-MI] | Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX] |
Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] | Rep. Mark Takano [D-CA] | Rep. Corrine Brown [D-FL] | Rep. Janice Hahn [D-CA] |
Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV] | Rep. G. Butterfield [D-NC] | Rep. Andre Carson [D-IN] | Rep. Donna Edwards [D-MD] |
Rep. Joyce Beatty [D-OH] | Rep. Charles Rangel [D-NY] | Rep. Brenda Lawrence [D-MI] | Rep. Steve Chabot [R-OH] |
Rep. Eddie Johnson [D-TX] | Rep. Marcia Fudge [D-OH] | Rep. Gregory Meeks [D-NY] | Rep. Richard Neal [D-MA] |
Rep. Michael Turner [R-OH] | Rep. Robin Kelly [D-IL] | Rep. Jim Cooper [D-TN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-10 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services. |
2015-02-10 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E185-186) |
2015-02-10 | House | Introduced in House |
2015-02-09 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E177) |
2015-02-05 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E173-174) |
Same As/Similar To
SB693 (Same As) 2015-03-10 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Subjects
Art, artists, authorship
Arts, culture, religion
Congressional tributes
Music
Performing arts
Racial and ethnic relations
Arts, culture, religion
Congressional tributes
Music
Performing arts
Racial and ethnic relations
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-bill/839/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hr839/BILLS-114hr839ih.pdf |