US HB835 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-8)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Family-Based Foster Care Services Act of 2015 Amends title XIX (Medicaid) of the Social Security Act to extend medical assistance coverage to therapeutic foster care services. Requires a qualified therapeutic foster care program to be state-licensed and provide: foster care children under 21 with structured daily activities, including the development of age-appropriate social, communication and behavioral skills, trauma-informed and gender-responsive services, crisis intervention and crisis support services, medication monitoring, counseling, and case management; and biological parents, kinship caregivers, and foster care parents with specialized training and consultation in the management of children with mental illness, trauma, other emotional or behavioral disorders, medically fragile conditions, or developmental disabilities, the impact of trauma on child and caregiver, and specific additional training on the needs of each child provided such services.
Title
Family-Based Foster Care Services Act of 2015
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-13 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2015-02-10 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2015-02-10 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB919 (Related) 2015-02-27 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SB429 (Related) 2015-02-10 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB473 (Related) 2015-02-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB429 (Related) 2015-02-10 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB473 (Related) 2015-02-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
Adoption and foster care
Child care and development
Child health
Disability and paralysis
Health
Medicaid
Mental health
Child care and development
Child health
Disability and paralysis
Health
Medicaid
Mental health
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-bill/835/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hr835/BILLS-114hr835ih.pdf |